05/21/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2021. | |||
05/21/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/17/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1112.) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1155.) | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2021 | Introduced. To print. |