1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 76 CHAPTER 51Relative to Emergency Medical Services Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 11, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 76, Rodriguez. Emergency Medical Services Week.This measure would proclaim the week of May 16, 2021, to May 22, 2021, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, It is estimated that there are over 840,000 emergency medical services personnel in the United States, including over 80,000 in the State of California; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical services are a vital public service and the members of emergency medical services teams are ready to provide life-saving care to those in need 24 hours a day, seven days a week; andWHEREAS, The emergency medical service system consists of emergency physicians, emergency nurses, emergency medical technicians, paramedics, firefighters, educators, administrators, and others; andWHEREAS, The members of emergency medical services teams, whether career or volunteer, engage in thousands of hours of specialized training and continuing education to enhance their life-saving skills; and WHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers are dedicated to saving lives and possess a sense of duty to aid others that is inherent in the profession and that stays with an emergency medical service provider for life; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers have made significant sacrifices in the course of duty, including the loss of life in service of others; andWHEREAS, Approximately 25 to 30 million patients nationwide, and over 2 million patients in California, receive emergency medical services each year; andWHEREAS, Access to quality emergency medical care dramatically improves the survival and recovery rates of those who experience sudden illness or injury; andWHEREAS, The COVID-19 pandemic has had a devastating impact on California. Although the pandemic is far from over, the hard work and dedication of emergency responders during the COVID-19 pandemic is second to none; and WHEREAS, The American College of Emergency Physicians was instrumental in establishing National Emergency Medical Services Week to honor the life-saving efforts of emergency medical services personnel; andWHEREAS, President Gerald Ford proclaimed the first National Emergency Medical Services Week in November of 1974; andWHEREAS, This year marks the 46th anniversary of National Emergency Medical Services Week; andWHEREAS, The theme of National Emergency Medical Services Week is This is EMS: Caring for Our Communities; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize the value and accomplishments of emergency medical services personnel by designating Emergency Medical Services Week in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of May 16, 2021, to May 22, 2021, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature additionally recognizes the incredible work of emergency medical services personnel during the COVID-19 pandemic; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 03, 2021 Passed IN Senate June 01, 2021 Passed IN Assembly May 17, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 76Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Burke, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nguyen, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)April 26, 2021Relative to Emergency Medical Services Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 76, Rodriguez. Emergency Medical Services Week.This measure would proclaim the week of May 16, 2021, to May 22, 2021, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, It is estimated that there are over 840,000 emergency medical services personnel in the United States, including over 80,000 in the State of California; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical services are a vital public service and the members of emergency medical services teams are ready to provide life-saving care to those in need 24 hours a day, seven days a week; andWHEREAS, The emergency medical service system consists of emergency physicians, emergency nurses, emergency medical technicians, paramedics, firefighters, educators, administrators, and others; andWHEREAS, The members of emergency medical services teams, whether career or volunteer, engage in thousands of hours of specialized training and continuing education to enhance their life-saving skills; and WHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers are dedicated to saving lives and possess a sense of duty to aid others that is inherent in the profession and that stays with an emergency medical service provider for life; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers have made significant sacrifices in the course of duty, including the loss of life in service of others; andWHEREAS, Approximately 25 to 30 million patients nationwide, and over 2 million patients in California, receive emergency medical services each year; andWHEREAS, Access to quality emergency medical care dramatically improves the survival and recovery rates of those who experience sudden illness or injury; andWHEREAS, The COVID-19 pandemic has had a devastating impact on California. Although the pandemic is far from over, the hard work and dedication of emergency responders during the COVID-19 pandemic is second to none; and WHEREAS, The American College of Emergency Physicians was instrumental in establishing National Emergency Medical Services Week to honor the life-saving efforts of emergency medical services personnel; andWHEREAS, President Gerald Ford proclaimed the first National Emergency Medical Services Week in November of 1974; andWHEREAS, This year marks the 46th anniversary of National Emergency Medical Services Week; andWHEREAS, The theme of National Emergency Medical Services Week is This is EMS: Caring for Our Communities; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize the value and accomplishments of emergency medical services personnel by designating Emergency Medical Services Week in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of May 16, 2021, to May 22, 2021, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature additionally recognizes the incredible work of emergency medical services personnel during the COVID-19 pandemic; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|