09/17/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/17/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/02/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2358.) | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Measure version as revised on May 13 corrected. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1412.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2021 | Introduced. To print. |