Senate | 01/19/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 159.) | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 11). | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2021 | Introduced. To print. |