07/15/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/15/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/05/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1806.) | ||
Senate | 06/30/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1972.) | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2021 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2021 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2021 | Introduced. To print. |