07/20/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/20/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1993.) | ||
Senate | 07/14/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2016.) | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Introduced. To print. |