09/17/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/17/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/02/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2347.) | ||
Senate | 08/25/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2402.) | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2021 | Introduced. To print. |