Senate | 09/10/2021 | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2438.) | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2021 | Introduced. To print. |