Assembly | 07/05/2021 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Kalra. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. To print. |