09/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/26/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2114.) | ||
Senate | 07/07/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1340.) | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | Introduced. To print. |