08/27/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2021. | |||
08/27/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/23/2021 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2465.). | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2039.) | ||
Senate | 07/08/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2021 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2021 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1971.) | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | Introduced. To print. |