09/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/31/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2218.). | ||
Senate | 07/14/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13). | ||
Senate | 07/07/2021 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 2. Page 2130.) | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2021 | Introduced. To print. |