09/17/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/17/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2021 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2839.). | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2021 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2333.) | ||
Senate | 07/13/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2021 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1246.) | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Introduced. To print. |