08/19/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/19/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/16/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4843.) | ||
Senate | 08/03/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | Introduced. To print. |