Senate | 08/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.M. | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2022 | Introduced. To print. |