08/23/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/23/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/18/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4881.) | ||
Senate | 08/11/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 10). | ||
Senate | 08/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Introduced. To print. |