Senate | 08/03/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Introduced. To print. |