07/15/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/15/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/05/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1802.) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 861.) | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 24). | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2021 | Introduced. To print. |