Senate | 08/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 4. Page 2401.) | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2021 | Introduced. To print. |