Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4575.). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2022 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2022 | Introduced. |