Assembly | 06/21/2021 | Read. Adopted. (Page 2034.). | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2021 | Introduced. |