California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR54 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 06/09/2021

                            CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 54Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 09, 2021 Relative to the 71st anniversary of the Korean War. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 54, as introduced, Choi. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The year 2021 marks the 71st anniversary of the Korean War, which began on June 25, 1950, with the invasion by communist forces led by Kim Il Sung; andWHEREAS, The Korean War not only devastated the country of Korea, but also significantly and negatively impacted many countries of the world, including the United States of America; andWHEREAS, The Korean Peninsula is still the way it was in 1953, with the demilitarized zone being guarded by artillery and patrolled by troops; andWHEREAS, Korea is still divided into North and South since the Korean Armistice Agreement was signed on July 27, 1953, in Panmunjom; andWHEREAS, This decades-long conflict has split families and continues to have a devastating impact on the people of North and South Korea; andWHEREAS, The division of the Korean Peninsula separated more than 10 million Korean family members, including some who are now citizens of the United States; andWHEREAS, According to the 2010 United States census and with current estimates, there are roughly 750,000 people in California who self-identify as Korean in origin, making California the state with the largest Korean population; andWHEREAS, Approximately 150,000 United States citizens reside in South Korea; andWHEREAS, The prospect of peace and prosperity in the region has been far too long a distant dream for so many who call North and South Korea home; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the members of the Assembly join the Korean-American communities throughout the state in marking June 25, 2021, as the 71st anniversary of the Korean War; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 54Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 09, 2021 Relative to the 71st anniversary of the Korean War. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 54, as introduced, Choi. Digest Key





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 House Resolution 

No. 54

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-SilvaJune 09, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Members Choi and Quirk-Silva
June 09, 2021

 Relative to the 71st anniversary of the Korean War. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 54, as introduced, Choi. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The year 2021 marks the 71st anniversary of the Korean War, which began on June 25, 1950, with the invasion by communist forces led by Kim Il Sung; and

WHEREAS, The Korean War not only devastated the country of Korea, but also significantly and negatively impacted many countries of the world, including the United States of America; and

WHEREAS, The Korean Peninsula is still the way it was in 1953, with the demilitarized zone being guarded by artillery and patrolled by troops; and

WHEREAS, Korea is still divided into North and South since the Korean Armistice Agreement was signed on July 27, 1953, in Panmunjom; and

WHEREAS, This decades-long conflict has split families and continues to have a devastating impact on the people of North and South Korea; and

WHEREAS, The division of the Korean Peninsula separated more than 10 million Korean family members, including some who are now citizens of the United States; and

WHEREAS, According to the 2010 United States census and with current estimates, there are roughly 750,000 people in California who self-identify as Korean in origin, making California the state with the largest Korean population; and

WHEREAS, Approximately 150,000 United States citizens reside in South Korea; and

WHEREAS, The prospect of peace and prosperity in the region has been far too long a distant dream for so many who call North and South Korea home; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the members of the Assembly join the Korean-American communities throughout the state in marking June 25, 2021, as the 71st anniversary of the Korean War; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States, and to the author for appropriate distribution.