California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR6 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/09/2020

                            CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 6Introduced by Assembly Members Cervantes and Quirk-Silva(Coauthor: Assembly Member Maienschein)December 09, 2020 Relative to Proposition 13 and Homeowners Protection Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 6, as introduced, Cervantes. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Proposition 13 was overwhelmingly approved by the people of California by an affirmative vote of 62.6 percent on June 6, 1978; andWHEREAS, Before the approval of Proposition 13, property taxes imposed on California homeowners were skyrocketing, sometimes increasing 50 or 100 percent in a single year; andWHEREAS, The increase in property taxes would have forced many homeowners, especially retired Californians, to lose their homes even after paying off their mortgages; andWHEREAS, Without Proposition 13, the independence of retired Californians who own their own homes would have been threatened by the prospect of poverty or homelessness, despite decades of working hard and paying into pensions or Social Security; andWHEREAS, The approval of Proposition 13 protected homeowner rights by making property taxes both lower and more predictable; andWHEREAS, Proposition 13 has continued to save homeowners tens of thousands of dollars in taxes, which they can use to grow their savings, pay off their mortgages, and ensure their financial independence; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly declares June 1, 2021, to June 7, 2021, inclusive, as Proposition 13 and Homeowners Rights Protection Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION House Resolution No. 6Introduced by Assembly Members Cervantes and Quirk-Silva(Coauthor: Assembly Member Maienschein)December 09, 2020 Relative to Proposition 13 and Homeowners Protection Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTHR 6, as introduced, Cervantes. Digest Key





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 House Resolution 

No. 6

Introduced by Assembly Members Cervantes and Quirk-Silva(Coauthor: Assembly Member Maienschein)December 09, 2020

Introduced by Assembly Members Cervantes and Quirk-Silva(Coauthor: Assembly Member Maienschein)
December 09, 2020

 Relative to Proposition 13 and Homeowners Protection Week. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

HR 6, as introduced, Cervantes. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Proposition 13 was overwhelmingly approved by the people of California by an affirmative vote of 62.6 percent on June 6, 1978; and

WHEREAS, Before the approval of Proposition 13, property taxes imposed on California homeowners were skyrocketing, sometimes increasing 50 or 100 percent in a single year; and

WHEREAS, The increase in property taxes would have forced many homeowners, especially retired Californians, to lose their homes even after paying off their mortgages; and

WHEREAS, Without Proposition 13, the independence of retired Californians who own their own homes would have been threatened by the prospect of poverty or homelessness, despite decades of working hard and paying into pensions or Social Security; and

WHEREAS, The approval of Proposition 13 protected homeowner rights by making property taxes both lower and more predictable; and

WHEREAS, Proposition 13 has continued to save homeowners tens of thousands of dollars in taxes, which they can use to grow their savings, pay off their mortgages, and ensure their financial independence; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly declares June 1, 2021, to June 7, 2021, inclusive, as Proposition 13 and Homeowners Rights Protection Week; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.