|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 236, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2349.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 2598.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1178.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 756.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 518.) (March 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2021
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referral to Com. on G.O. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., EQ., and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|