Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 589.) (March 23). | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/29/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 28. | ||
Senate | 12/28/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |