|
07/01/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4265.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5305.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|