Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3932.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3779.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3182.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|