Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | April 5 set for final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 7. Page 669.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2021 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | March 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | March 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Set for hearing March 8. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/31/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 30. | ||
Senate | 12/30/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |