Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
June 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
June 14 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2022
|
June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 3869.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3780.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3440.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|