Assembly | 08/30/2022 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bloom. | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/10/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 10). | ||
Assembly | 08/03/2022 | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.M. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 3831.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 3511.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |