California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2022

Amended

Bill June 6, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022