07/01/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2022. | |||
07/01/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/24/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Senate | 06/21/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2022 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2022 | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3861.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3325.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |