Senate | 04/27/2022 | April 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3539.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |