|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 991, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 5077.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 5927.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3865.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|