Assembly | 06/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3985.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3781.) (May 19). | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 3184.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |