California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill June 13, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022