California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022