Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 3307.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Set for hearing April 4. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |