Senate | 05/25/2022 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3782.) (May 19). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (May 4). | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |