Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3281.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3203.) (March 23). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Set for hearing March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |