California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1083 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 8, 2022