California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 6, 2022
Bill April 4, 2022