California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1090 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022