|
09/27/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 614, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5226.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6002.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 5890.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
June 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3253.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|