|
07/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1865.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Urgency clause adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2211.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 886.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 728.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|