Senate | 04/27/2022 | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |