Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | April 13 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS, ED., and JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2021 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2021 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |