California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Amended

Bill June 30, 2022
Bill May 23, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022