California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1155 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill August 4, 2022
Bill June 9, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill May 5, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022