LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1156
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1156
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1156
Action History
Senate
05/04/2022
May 4 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3608.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
04/20/2022
Set for hearing May 4.
Senate
03/17/2022
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
02/18/2022
From printer.
Senate
02/17/2022
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
Senate
02/17/2022
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.